U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00298-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kelly
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 30, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.