U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00306-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nordahl
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 05, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 05, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 05, 2022: [Discovery]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 25, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.