U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Juan Carlos Arellano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 25, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.