U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00276-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kanahele
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • August 26, 2022: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.