U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00302-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goodrich
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.