U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Covarrubias-Guerrero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 10, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 02, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 02, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.