U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00168-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 29, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 29, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.