U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00288-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mashi
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 12, 2023: [Extension of Time]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 06, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Discovery]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.