U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00295-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Altalibi et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • May 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 07, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • May 01, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Release Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 10, 2025: [Release Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Judgment]
November, 2024
  • November 11, 2024: [Joinder]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 08, 2024: [Trial Order]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Discovery]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 09, 2023: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Detention]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • December 19, 2022: [Review of Detention by District Judge]
  • December 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • November 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 15, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 14, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 10, 2022: [Unseal Case]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 22, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 05, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 30, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 30, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 29, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.