U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 13, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 01, 2022: [Detention]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.