U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00324-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dewegeli
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 01, 2022: [Review of Detention]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 09, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 09, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 08, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 08, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.