U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00323-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oliver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 09, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 09, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.