U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00328-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Pulido-Romero et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 09, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Detention]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 12, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.