U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00304-3
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • January 05, 2023: [Unseal Document]
  • January 05, 2023: [Discovery]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • January 05, 2023: [Brady Order]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 12, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 01, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • November 01, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 01, 2022: [Unseal Case]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 14, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 14, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 14, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.