U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00322-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 17, 2023: [Petition and Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 16, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 16, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • September 15, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.