U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00284-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Judd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 20, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 15, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 15, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.