U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00239-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention by District Judge]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2022: [Review of Detention by District Judge]
  • December 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • November 29, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 19, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 16, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.