U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00341-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pete
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • September 23, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 23, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • September 21, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.