U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Griffiths
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Exclude]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 16, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 28, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 28, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.