U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00347-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Olmedo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 28, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 21, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.