U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00349-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 22, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 22, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.