U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00351-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez-Luna
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 22, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 22, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.