U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Price
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Fast Track Deadlines]
  • December 01, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.