U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moyer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 04, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Discovery]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.