U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sjodin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 10, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 10, 2023: [Show Cause]
  • January 10, 2023: [Hearing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Produce]
  • January 10, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2022: [Discovery]
  • December 15, 2022: [Speedy Trial]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Discovery]
  • December 07, 2022: [Hearing]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Vacate]
  • November 30, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 28, 2022: [Produce]
  • November 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 17, 2022: [Hearing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Suppress]
  • November 07, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 28, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Review of Detention by District Judge]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 12, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.