U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00350-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Villiard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2022: [Remand]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 29, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 29, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 29, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.