U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00360-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Case
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 06, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 06, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 05, 2022: [Detention]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.