U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 06, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 30, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.