U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00342-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baca-Diaz et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 16, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 17, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • October 17, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.