U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00369-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swiger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 10, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 06, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • October 06, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.