U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Epperly
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [U-ACT Ineligible Participant Order]
March, 2025
  • March 10, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2025: [Continue]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 12, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 11, 2022: [Detention]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.