U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00371-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 11, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 11, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.