U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00374-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Recendez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Review of Detention]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 13, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.