U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richard Brian Jessop
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 26, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • October 13, 2022: [Unseal Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.