U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00348-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mitchell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 07, 2024: [Order Withdrawing Warrant]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 17, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 17, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 17, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 17, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.