U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00285-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 08, 2022: [Discovery]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 17, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.