U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00380-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blake
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 17, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.