U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00379-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ferguson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 27, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • October 18, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2022: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.