U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00377-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos-Mendez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Fast Track Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.