U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00391-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fraga
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 24, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 24, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Detention]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 21, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.