U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00395-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Melendez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.