U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00392-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Foote et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 31, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 24, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • October 24, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 24, 2022: [Detention]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 21, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.