U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Law
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
  • March 18, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 25, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 23, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 24, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.