U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peterson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [U-ACT Referral Order]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Petition and Order]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 31, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 26, 2022: [Detention]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.