U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00058-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor Denise Marsh, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 28, 2022: [Consent Order Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 02, 2022: [Petition and Order]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • October 26, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • October 26, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 26, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.