U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00413-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Shields et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Judgment]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 02, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Protective Order]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 27, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 26, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • October 26, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.