U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kerby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 03, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 01, 2022: [Detention]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.