U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00415-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medina
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 27, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 27, 2022: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.