U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Angilau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 08, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.