U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00372-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • October 28, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 26, 2022: [Detention]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 26, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.